EP4376442 - MEMBRANE MICROELECTROMECHANICAL ELECTROACUSTIC TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERINI, Fabrizio 20013 MAGENTA (MI) / IT | 02 /
ADORNO, Silvia 20026 NOVATE MILANESE (MI) / IT | 03 /
SALINA, Marco 26010 CREMOSANO (CR) / IT | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 24169393.6 | 28.03.2023 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | IT20220007043 | 08.04.2022 Original published format: IT202200007043 | IT20220011810 | 03.06.2022 Original published format: IT202200011810 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4376442 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4376442 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04R7/06, H04R17/00 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
H04R7/06 (EP,US);
H04R1/02 (CN);
H04R17/005 (US);
H04R17/00 (EP);
H04R7/18 (US);
H10N30/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/22] | H04R17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Title | German: | MIKROELEKTROMECHANISCHER MEMBRAN-ELEKTROAKUSTIKWANDLER | [2024/22] | English: | MEMBRANE MICROELECTROMECHANICAL ELECTROACUSTIC TRANSDUCER | [2024/22] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR ÉLECTROACOUSTIQUE MICROÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE À MEMBRANE | [2024/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP23164594.6 / EP4258691 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2020100033 (STOPPEL FABIAN [DE], et al); | [Y]EP3675522 (SONION NEDERLAND BV [NL]); | [Y]CN112004181 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL); | [Y]CN113490120 (RUISHENG KAITAI TECH WUHAN CO LTD, et al); | [XYI]EP3934275 (XMEMS LABS INC [US]) |