Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4446592 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202410312877 EP24169831 US202418609636



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2024344519Global Dossier 17.10.2024A1
Priority number Date
SE2350438 14.04.2023
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN118793625Global Dossier 18.10.2024A
Priority number Date
SE2350438 14.04.2023
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4446592Global Dossier 16.10.2024A1
Priority number Date
SE2350438 14.04.2023
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SE2350438 15.10.2024A1
Priority number Date
SE2350438 14.04.2023