EP4400043 - METHODS FOR ANALYTE MONITORING MANAGEMENT AND ANALYTE MEASUREMENT DATA MANAGEMENT, AND ARTICLES OF MANUFACTURE RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Diabetes Care, Inc. 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US | [2024/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROUTHER, Nathan Christopher San Francisco, CA, 94107 / US | 02 /
DUNN, Timothy Christian San Francisco, CA, 94117 / US | [2024/29] | Representative(s) | Booth, Catherine Louise, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/29] | Application number, filing date | 24169935.4 | 27.09.2012 | [2024/29] | Priority number, date | US201161540332P | 28.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161540332 P | [2024/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4400043 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4400043 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/7282 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (US);
A61B5/742 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYTÜBERWACHUNGSVERWALTUNG UND ANALYTMESSDATENVERWALTUNG SOWIE DAMIT ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDE HERSTELLUNGSARTIKEL | [2024/29] | English: | METHODS FOR ANALYTE MONITORING MANAGEMENT AND ANALYTE MEASUREMENT DATA MANAGEMENT, AND ARTICLES OF MANUFACTURE RELATED THERETO | [2024/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DE SURVEILLANCE D'ANALYTE ET DE GESTION DE DONNÉES DE MESURE D'ANALYTE, ET ARTICLES DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉS | [2024/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12836194.6 / EP2760335 | EP20163263.5 / EP3689235 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4545382 | US4711245 | US5262035 | US5262305 | US5264014 | US5320715 | US5356786 | US5509410 | US5593852 | US5601435 | US5628890 | US5822715 | US5820551 | US5899855 | US5918603 | US6071391 | US6121009 | US6120676 | US6144837 | US6143164 | US6161095 | US6175752 | US6270455 | US6284478 | US6299757 | US6338790 | US6377894 | US6461496 | US6503381 | US6514460 | US6514718 | US6540891 | US6560471 | US6591125 | US6592745 | US6600997 | US6616819 | US6618934 | US6676816 | US6730200 | US6736957 | US6746582 | US6749740 | US6764581 | US6773671 | US2004186365 | US6881551 | US6893545 | US6942518 | US2006025662 | US2006091006 | US7041468 | US7167818 | US2007068807 | US2007095661 | US2007108048 | US2007199818 | US7299082 | US2008066305 | US2008102441 | US2008148873 | US2008267823 | US2010198034 | US19390611496 | US20060461725 | US20090495709 |