EP4397425 - BUILD MATERIAL HANDLING UNIT FOR A POWDER MODULE FOR AN APPARATUS FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concept Laser GmbH Rudolf-Diesel-Straße 14 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eideloth, Dominik 96250 Ebensfeld / DE | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 24170734.8 | 20.12.2018 | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4397425 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4397425 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/255, B29C64/194, B29C64/364, B29C64/188, B22F3/105, B33Y40/00 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
B29C64/194 (EP,US);
B01D67/00045 (US);
B01D67/00415 (US);
B01L5/00 (US);
B22F10/00 (US);
B22F10/32 (EP,US);
B22F10/85 (US);
B22F12/00 (US);
B22F12/60 (EP,US);
B22F12/82 (US);
B29C64/00 (US);
B29C64/10 (US);
B29C64/176 (US);
B29C64/182 (US);
B29C64/188 (EP);
B29C64/20 (US);
B29C64/205 (US);
B29C64/227 (US);
B29C64/245 (US);
B29C64/25 (US);
B29C64/255 (EP,US);
B29C64/30 (US);
B29C64/307 (US);
B29C64/364 (EP);
B29C64/386 (US);
B29C64/393 (EP,US);
B29C64/40 (US);
B29C65/8253 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/10 (US);
B33Y40/20 (US);
B33Y50/00 (US);
B33Y50/02 (US);
B33Y70/00 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
B33Y99/00 (US);
B22F10/10 (EP,US);
B28B1/001 (US);
B29C64/141 (EP);
B29C64/165 (EP);
B29C64/259 (EP);
B29C64/321 (EP);
B29C64/357 (EP);
B29C64/371 (EP);
B29C65/8292 (US);
G01N1/28 (US);
G01N2021/95676 (US);
G01N2223/418 (US);
G01N23/2251 (US);
G01N33/50 (US);
G02B21/34 (US);
G03F7/70416 (US);
G03G2215/2054 (US);
G05B2219/49023 (US);
G05B2219/49246 (US);
G06T2207/10061 (US);
G06V2201/122 (US);
H01J2237/006 (US);
H01J2237/2003 (US);
H01J2237/2608 (US);
H01J37/20 (US);
H01J37/3244 (US);
Y02P10/25 (EP);
Y10S148/143 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/28] | B22F3/105 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Title | German: | BAUMATERIALHANDHABUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EIN PULVERMODUL FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTS | [2024/28] | English: | BUILD MATERIAL HANDLING UNIT FOR A POWDER MODULE FOR AN APPARATUS FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT | [2024/28] | French: | UNITÉ DE MANIPULATION DE MATÉRIAU DE CONSTRUCTION POUR UN MODULE DE POUDRE POUR UN APPAREIL DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE D'OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2024/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18214640.7 / EP3670150 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2957365 (IMR SRL [IT]); | [IA]WO2017100695 (VELO3D INC [US]); | [XI]WO2018022002 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO LP [US]) |