EP4424319 - NOVEL LACTOBACILLUS HAVING VARIOUS FUNCTIONS, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University - Industry Cooperation Group of Kyung Hee University 1732 Deogyeong-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17104 / KR | For all designated states Navipharm Co., Ltd. 5, Jangan-ro 448beon-gil, Jangan-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16209 / KR | [2024/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dong Hyun 02823 Seoul / KR | 02 /
HAN, Myung Joo 02823 Seoul / KR | [2024/36] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2024/36] | Application number, filing date | 24172997.9 | 07.09.2016 | [2024/36] | Priority number, date | KR20150130124 | 15.09.2015 Original published format: KR 20150130124 | KR20160005018 | 15.01.2016 Original published format: KR 20160005018 | [2024/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4424319 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4424319 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A23L33/135, A61K35/747, A61K35/745, C12R1/225, C12R1/24, C12R1/25, A61P25/28, A61K36/48, A61K35/00, A61P1/04, A61P11/06, A61P17/06, A61P29/00 | [2024/43] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K35/745 (CN,KR,RU,US);
C12N1/20 (CN,KR,RU);
A23L33/135 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (CN);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (CN,RU);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN);
A61P37/08 (CN);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (CN,KR,US);
A23V2200/304 (KR);
A23V2200/322 (KR);
A23V2200/332 (KR);
A23V2400/121 (CN);
A23V2400/151 (KR,US);
A23V2400/169 (CN,US);
A23V2400/533 (CN);
A61K2035/115 (US);
C12R2001/225 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K35/745, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K35/747, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/324, A23V2200/304, A23V2200/30, A23V2200/32 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2024/36] | A61K35/747, A61K35/745, A61K36/48, A61K35/00, C12R1/225, C12R1/24, C12R1/25, A61P25/28, A23L33/135, C12N1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/36] | Title | German: | NEUER LACTOBACILLUS MIT VERSCHIEDENEN FUNKTIONEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/36] | English: | NOVEL LACTOBACILLUS HAVING VARIOUS FUNCTIONS, AND USE THEREOF | [2024/36] | French: | NOUVEAU LACTOBACILLUS AYANT DIVERSES FONCTIONS ET SON UTILISATION | [2024/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16846789.2 / EP3351617 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | KR20060119045 | KR20090116051 | KR20100010015 | KR20130092182 | KR20140006509 |