EP4391762 - STAIRCASE STRUCTURE IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL MEMORY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yangtze Memory Technologies Co., Ltd. No.88 Weilai 3rd Road East Lake High-tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Zhong Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Zhongwang Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Wenxi Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | 04 /
XIA, Zhiliang Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 24174671.8 | 23.03.2020 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4391762 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Classification | IPC: | H10B43/50 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H10B41/10 (EP,KR,US);
H10B41/27 (EP,CN,KR);
H10B41/35 (CN,US);
H10B41/20 (US);
H10B41/50 (EP,KR);
H10B43/10 (EP,KR,US);
H10B43/20 (US);
H10B43/27 (EP,CN,KR);
H10B43/35 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Title | German: | TREPPENSTRUKTUR IN EINER DREIDIMENSIONALEN SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG DAVON | [2024/26] | English: | STAIRCASE STRUCTURE IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL MEMORY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE SAME | [2024/26] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ESCALIER DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE MÉMOIRE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION | [2024/26] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20926360.7 / EP3931870 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |