EP4391662 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER HEADROOM REPORTING PROCEDURE FOR NEW RADIO CARRIER AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 222 West Merchandise Mart Plaza, Suite 1800 Chicago, IL 60654 / US | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÖHR, Joachim 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
BASU MALLICK, Prateek 63303 Dreieich / DE | 03 /
KUCHIBHOTLA, Ravi Clarendon Hills, 60514 / US | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 24174829.2 | 28.02.2018 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | US201715465235 | 21.03.2017 Original published format: US201715465235 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4391662 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4391662 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/36, H04W52/34 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
H04W52/34 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/365 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04L27/26025 (KR);
H04L5/001 (KR,US);
H04W52/146 (CN);
H04W52/367 (CN,KR);
H04W52/42 (CN);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2024/26] | H04W52/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR LEISTUNGSRESERVENMELDUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR NEW-RADIO-TRÄGERAGGREGATION | [2024/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER HEADROOM REPORTING PROCEDURE FOR NEW RADIO CARRIER AGGREGATION | [2024/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PROCÉDURE DE RAPPORT DE MARGE DE PUISSANCE POUR UNE AGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES RADIO NOUVELLE | [2024/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18710718.0 / EP3603229 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |