EP4397808 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A FIBER FRACTIONATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Paper Company 6400 Poplar Avenue Memphis, TN 38197 / US | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAAKKOLA, Jyrki, Tapio Gainesville, 30506 / US | 02 /
HEIKKINEN, Antti Treasure Island, 33706 / US | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 24176559.3 | 18.09.2018 | [2024/28] | Priority number, date | US201762559861P | 18.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762559861 P | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4397808 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4397808 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D21D99/00, D21G9/00 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
D21D99/00 (EP,US);
D21D5/06 (US);
B03B13/00 (US);
B03B5/56 (US);
D21G9/0018 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2024/28] | D21G9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES FASERFRAKTIONIERUNGSSYSTEMS | [2024/28] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A FIBER FRACTIONATION SYSTEM | [2024/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE FRACTIONNEMENT DE FIBRE | [2024/28] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18826453.5 / EP3684972 | EP23193504.0 / EP4293157 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4276159 | US5566833 | US5601192 |