EP4393465 - THERMO-THERAPEUTIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceragem Co., Ltd. 10 Jeongja 1-gil Seonggeo-eup Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si, Chungcheongnam-do 31045 / KR | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Dong Myoung Asan-si 31416 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ki Sung Cheonan-si 31175 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Sang Cheol Cheonan-si 31179 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jin Cheol Cheonan-si 31037 / KR | [2024/35] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 24176780.5 | 12.01.2018 | [2024/27] | Priority number, date | KR20170045132 | 07.04.2017 Original published format: KR 20170045132 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4393465 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4393465 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61H15/02, A61H7/00, A61F7/00, A61N5/06, A61H15/00 | [2024/38] | CPC: |
A61H15/02 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61H1/00 (CN,US);
A61F7/00 (CN,US);
A61F7/007 (EP,KR,US);
A61H15/00 (US);
A61H15/0078 (EP,US);
A61H7/00 (US);
A61H7/004 (KR);
A61N5/0625 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2007/0011 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2007/0024 (EP,CN,US);
A61H2015/0014 (KR);
A61H2015/0021 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0142 (EP);
A61H2201/0196 (CN);
A61H2201/0207 (EP,CN,US);
A61H2201/0235 (EP);
A61H2201/10 (CN);
A61H2201/1207 (EP);
A61H2201/1623 (EP);
A61H2201/1669 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP);
A61H2201/5023 (KR);
A61H2201/5058 (KR);
A61H2201/5071 (EP,CN,US);
A61H2203/0443 (EP);
A61H2205/04 (CN);
A61H2205/081 (EP,CN);
A61H2230/80 (EP);
A61H2230/805 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2024/27] | A61H15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOTHERAPEUTISCHES GERÄT | [2024/27] | English: | THERMO-THERAPEUTIC APPARATUS | [2024/27] | French: | APPAREIL THERMO-THÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2024/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18780401.8 / EP3607927 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO02069980 | KR20030063775 | US2004260215 | JP2013005899 |