Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4461744 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2021208493 CA3168108 CN202180009530 EP2021050707W EP21700027 EP24189800 IL29444522 JP2022542383 JP2023218988 KR20227026828

More

US202117150025 US202217814966 US202418655708



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024294582Global Dossier 05.09.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202117150025 15.01.2021
EP20152217 16.01.2020
US202217814966 26.07.2022
US202418655708 06.05.2024
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12012435Global Dossier 18.06.2024B2
US2023049056 16.02.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202117150025 15.01.2021
EP20152217 16.01.2020
US202217814966 26.07.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20220128372Global Dossier 20.09.2022A
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024045126Global Dossier 02.04.2024A
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
JP2022542383 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7485771BGlobal Dossier 16.05.2024B2
JP2023500749 10.01.2023A
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL294445Global Dossier 01.10.2023B2
IL294445 01.06.2023B1
IL294445 01.09.2022A
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4090363Global Dossier 04.09.2024B1
EP4090363 23.11.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN115038461Global Dossier 09.09.2022A
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3168108Global Dossier 22.07.2021A1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2021208493BGlobal Dossier 30.03.2023B2
AU2021208493 30.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4461744Global Dossier 08.01.2025A3
EP4461744 13.11.2024A2
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
EP21700027 14.01.2021
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112022013720 11.10.2022A2
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK4090363T 30.09.2024T3
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2987890T 18.11.2024T3
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FI4090363T 25.09.2024T3
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20241370T 20.12.2024T1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
EP21700027 14.01.2021
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LT4090363T 25.09.2024T
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2022008830 07.10.2022A
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL4090363T 25.11.2024T3
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS66031 29.11.2024B1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
EP21700027 14.01.2021
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SA522433319 10.07.2024B1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI4090363T 30.10.2024T1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
EP21700027 14.01.2021
WO2021EP50707 14.01.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2021144369Global Dossier 22.07.2021A1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11421003Global Dossier 23.08.2022B2
US2021221856 22.07.2021A1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR121066 13.04.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE068985T 28.02.2025T2
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT4090363T 19.09.2024T
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI868297B 01.01.2025B
TW202140521 01.11.2021A
Priority number Date
EP20152217 16.01.2020
TypeType Earlier application
 EP4090363