Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4442216 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4442216



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(20)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 326
09.12.2024 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.11.2024 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
04.11.2024 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.11.2024 European search opinion Search / examination 4
04.11.2024 European search report Search / examination 2
04.11.2024 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
28.10.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.10.2024 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.09.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.09.2024 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.07.2024 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.07.2024 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
31.07.2024 Claims Search / examination 2
31.07.2024 Description Search / examination 60
31.07.2024 Drawings Search / examination 27
31.07.2024 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.07.2024 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
20.02.2023 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 76
11.10.2021 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 133