Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4513550 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4513550



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(16)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 249
10.03.2025 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
04.02.2025 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.02.2025 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 11
04.02.2025 European search opinion Search / examination 5
04.02.2025 European search report Search / examination 2
04.02.2025 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
29.01.2025 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.01.2025 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 113
22.08.2024 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
21.08.2024 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.08.2024 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
21.08.2024 Claims Search / examination 4
21.08.2024 Description Search / examination 35
21.08.2024 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
21.08.2024 Drawings Search / examination 10
21.08.2024 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4