EP4517876 - COMPOSITION, ANODE AND BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2025 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2025 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.03.2025 [2025/10] | 31.01.2025 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.03.2025 [2025/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Largan Medical Co., Ltd. 2F, No. 14, Gongyequ 23rd Road Nantun District Taichung City 408 / TW | [2025/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wei-Yuan 408 Taichung City / TW | 02 /
CHEN, Po-Tsun 408 Taichung City / TW | 03 /
WANG, Tzu Lien 408 Taichung City / TW | 04 /
TSAI, Cheng-Yu 408 Taichung City / TW | 05 /
TENG, Chun-Hung 408 Taichung City / TW | [2025/10] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2025/10] | Application number, filing date | 24196740.5 | 27.08.2024 | [2025/10] | Priority number, date | US202363579965P | 01.09.2023 Original published format: US 202363579965 P | [2025/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4517876 | Date: | 05.03.2025 | Language: | EN | [2025/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2025 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/62 | [2025/10] | CPC: |
H01M4/386 (EP);
H01M4/366 (EP,KR);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M4/483 (KR);
H01M4/625 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2025/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | GE | Not yet paid | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ANODE UND BATTERIE | [2025/10] | English: | COMPOSITION, ANODE AND BATTERY | [2025/10] | French: | COMPOSITION, ANODE ET BATTERIE | [2025/10] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2024 | Examination requested [2025/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |