Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP4462073


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.03.2025 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.01.2025 Amendment by applicant
21.01.2025 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
29.11.2024 Publication of search report published on  01.01.2025  [2025/01]
29.11.2024 Change - classification published on  01.01.2025  [2025/01]
29.11.2024 Change - classification published on  01.01.2025  [2025/01]
11.10.2024 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.11.2024  [2024/46]
11.10.2024 Request for examination filed published on  13.11.2024  [2024/46]
30.09.2024 Change - representative
30.09.2024 New entry: Renewal fee paid