Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4478695 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4478695



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 399
10.03.2025 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
05.02.2025 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
31.01.2025 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.01.2025 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 20
31.01.2025 European search opinion Search / examination 7
31.01.2025 European search report Search / examination 2
31.01.2025 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.01.2025 Search started Search / examination 1
20.11.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.11.2024 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.11.2024 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
04.11.2024 Claims Search / examination 5
04.11.2024 Description Search / examination 114
04.11.2024 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
04.11.2024 Drawings Search / examination 52
04.11.2024 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
05.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 180