blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4520337

EP4520337 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES COMPRISING MODIFIED NUCLEOSIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  07.02.2025
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2025Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 12.03.2025  [2025/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SomaLogic Operating Co., Inc.
2945 Wilderness Place
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
[2025/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Carter, Jeff
Boulder, 80301 / US
02 / Gawande, Bharat
Boulder, 80301 / US
03 / Janjic, Nebojsa
Boulder, 80301 / US
04 / Schneider, Daniel
Boulder, 80301 / US
 [2025/11]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[2025/11]
Application number, filing date24213799.030.06.2017
[2025/11]
Priority number, dateUS201662357623P01.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662357623 P
US201662437592P21.12.2016         Original published format: US 201662437592 P
[2025/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4520337
Date:12.03.2025
Language:EN
[2025/11]
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/7115
[2025/11]
CPC:
C12N15/115 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61P3/06 (EP,CN,IL,RU); A61K31/7088 (CN);
A61K31/7115 (CN); A61K47/62 (CN); A61P9/10 (EP,CN,IL,RU);
C12N15/1048 (CN,IL,RU,US); C12N15/111 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); C12Q1/6804 (CN,KR);
C12Q1/6876 (CN,IL,US); G01N33/5308 (CN,KR); C12N2310/16 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/334 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); C12N2310/3341 (EP,CN,IL,US); C12N2310/335 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N2330/31 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); C12Q2525/117 (KR); C12Q2525/205 (KR) (-)
C-Set:
C12N15/1048, C12Q2525/117, C12Q2525/205 (CN);
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2525/117, C12Q2525/205 (CN)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2025/11]
TitleGerman:OLIGONUKLEOTIDE MIT MODIFIZIERTEN NUKLEOSIDEN[2025/11]
English:OLIGONUCLEOTIDES COMPRISING MODIFIED NUCLEOSIDES[2025/11]
French:OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES COMPRENANT DES NUCLÉOSIDES MODIFIÉS[2025/11]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP17740201.3  / EP3478843
EP21174810.8  / EP3913058
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
19.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inby applicantUS5270163
 US5475096
 US5580737
 US5660985
 US5705337
 US6376190
 US2007166740
 US2009098549
 US7855054
 US7947447
 US8409795
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.