Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4494671 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP20717948 EP24217745 IB2020052855 US202217903347



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2021191661Global Dossier 30.09.2021A1
Priority number Date
WO2020IB52855 26.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022409797Global Dossier 29.12.2022A1
Priority number Date
WO2020IB52855 26.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4126099Global Dossier 15.01.2025B1
EP4126099 08.02.2023A1
Priority number Date
WO2020IB52855 26.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4494671Global Dossier 26.03.2025A3
EP4494671 22.01.2025A2
Priority number Date
WO2020IB52855 26.03.2020
EP24217745 26.03.2020
EP20717948 26.03.2020
TypeType Earlier application
 EP4126099