EP0000136 - Device for measuring the toner concentration in a development mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1982/38] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prohaska, Peter Ammanstrasse 6 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78100137.5 | 12.06.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772727402 | 18.06.1977 Original published format: DE 2727402 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000136 | Date: | 10.01.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000136 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1978 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/09 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
G03G15/0853 (EP,US);
Y10S222/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung der Tonerkonzentration eines Entwicklergemisches | English: | Device for measuring the toner concentration in a development mixture | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la concentration en toner dans un mélange de développement | Examination procedure | 30.11.1978 | Examination requested | 28.06.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 17.03.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 04.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.03.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 14.01.1981 | Appeal received No. T0011/81 | 14.01.1981 | Statement of grounds filed | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [P]DE2746352 (HITACHI LTD); | [AD]DE2525952 (SAVIN BUSINESS MACHINES CORP); | [A]US3504276 (PROCTOR NOEL B, et al); | [A]US3094049 (CHRISTOPHER SNELLING) | Examination | FR2368068 |