EP0000356 - Stackable pallet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanders, Heinz Böhmerstrasse 2 D-5800 Hagen / DE | For all designated states Langmann, Horst Böhmerstrasse 2 D-5800 Hagen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanders, Heinz Böhmerstrasse 2 D-5800 Hagen / DE | 02 /
Langmann, Horst Böhmerstrasse 2 D-5800 Hagen / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Dörner, Lothar Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | Dörner, Lothar, Dipl.-Ing. Stresemannstrasse 15 D-58095 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 78100275.3 | 29.06.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772730879 | 08.07.1977 Original published format: DE 2730879 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000356 | Date: | 24.01.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000356 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1978 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/28 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
B65D19/0097 (EP,US);
B65D19/0012 (EP,US);
B65D19/0026 (EP,US);
B65D19/0028 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00024 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00059 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00094 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00288 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00293 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00298 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00323 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00333 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00338 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00343 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00373 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00378 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00557 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00572 (EP,US);
B65D2519/0094 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Stapelbare Flachpalette | English: | Stackable pallet | French: | Palette de manutention empilable | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.07.1979 | Examination requested | 24.10.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1981 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1544041 ; | FR1603898 [ ] |