EP0006845 - Pharmaceutical composition comprising a 5-aroyl-1-C1-5 alkyl-pyrrole-2-acetic acid compound and acetaminophen or acetylsalicylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/02] | Pharmaceutical composition comprising a 5-aroyl-1-lower alkyl-pyrrole-2-acetic acid compound and acetaminophen and/or acetylsalicylic acid | ||
[1982/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeilab, Inc. Camp Hill Road Fort Washington Pennsylvania 19034 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/02] | For all designated states McNeilab, Inc. Camp Hill Road Fort Washington Pennsylvania 19034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Stewart 527 Summit Avenue Fort Washington Pennsylvania / US | [1980/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/02] | Vossius, Volker, Dr. Vossius, Vossius, Hiltl, Tauchner, Heunemann Patentanwälte Siebertstrasse 4 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 78100344.7 | 10.07.1978 | [1980/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006845 | Date: | 23.01.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006845 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1978 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/60, A61K31/40, // (A61K31/60, 31:40),(A61K31/60, 31:40, 31:165) | [1982/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/60 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/40, A61K31/165 (EP);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/60, A61K31/40, A61K31/165 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/02] | A61K31/60, // (A61K31/60, 31:40, A61K31/40 ,(A61K31/40, 31:165) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE [1980/02] | Title | German: | Ein pharmazeutisches Präparat enthaltend ein Derivat einer 5-Aroyl-1-C1-5 alkyl-pyrrol-2-Essigsäure und Acetaminophen oder Acetylsalicylsäure | [1982/05] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition comprising a 5-aroyl-1-C1-5 alkyl-pyrrole-2-acetic acid compound and acetaminophen or acetylsalicylic acid | [1982/05] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique contenant un dérivé d'un acide 5-aroyle-1-alcoyle (C1-5) pyrrole-2-acétique et de l'acétaminophène ou de l'acide acétylsalicylique | [1982/05] |
Former [1980/02] | Ein pharmazeutisches Präparat enthaltend ein Derivat einer 5-Aroyl-1-niedrig alkyl-pyrrol-2-Essigsäure und Acetaminophen und/oder Acetylsalicylsäure | ||
Former [1980/02] | Pharmaceutical composition comprising a 5-aroyl-1-lower alkyl-pyrrole-2-acetic acid compound and acetaminophen and/or acetylsalicylic acid | ||
Former [1980/02] | Composition pharmaceutique contenant un dérivé d'un acide 5-aroyle-1-alcoyle inférieur-pyrrole-2-acétique et de l'acétaminophène et/ou de l'acide acétylsalicylique | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/21] | 06.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.08.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1982 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [D]US3752826 |