EP0000512 - Self-supporting helical coil type stirrer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenart, Wolfgang An der Froschlache 23 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Rau, Wolfgang, Dr. Turnerstrasse 161 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Baron, Hubertus, Dr. An der Froschlache 3 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78100383.5 | 12.07.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19770022777U | 21.07.1977 Original published format: DE 7722777 U | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000512 | Date: | 07.02.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000512 | Date: | 28.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1978 | Classification | IPC: | B01F7/24, B01F15/00, // C08F2/34 | [1981/04] | CPC: |
B01J8/10 (EP);
B01F27/1142 (EP);
B01F27/808 (EP);
B01F27/9213 (EP);
B01F35/3213 (EP);
B01J19/20 (EP);
B01J2219/185 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1981/04] | B01F15/00, B01F7/24, C08F2/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Frei tragender Wendelrührer | English: | Self-supporting helical coil type stirrer | French: | Agitateur hélicoidal auto-portant | Examination procedure | 15.03.1979 | Examination requested | 04.07.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 13.02.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 09.05.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE131726 ; | [D]DE1218265 (BASF AG); | [A]DE1442688 (BAYER AG); | [A]DE1507505 (DRAISWERKE GMBH); | [A]US3920223 (KRUEGER WALLACE F) |