EP0000543 - Construction set for climatised roofs or facades and its use as evaporator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.08.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wohlwend, Gertraud Im Hofi 590 FL-9497 Triesenberg / LI | [1980/06] |
Former [1980/06] | For all designated states PAN THERM GmbH Gesellschaft für Planung, Herstellung und Vertrieb von energiesparenden Heizungsanlagen Eibenweg 16 D-8411 Waldetzenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lex, Hans J. Tengstrasse 44 D-8000 München 40 / DE | 02 /
* * * | [N/P] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1982/17] |
Former [1980/06] | Liedl, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwalt Herterichstrasse 18 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 78100438.7 | 19.07.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772733899 | 27.07.1977 Original published format: DE 2733899 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0000543 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0000543 | Date: | 07.02.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000543 | Date: | 28.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1978 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/02 | [1981/04] | CPC: |
F24S10/755 (EP);
F24S20/67 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Bausatz für Klimadächer oder Klimafassaden und seine Verwendung als Verdampfer | English: | Construction set for climatised roofs or facades and its use as evaporator | French: | Dispositif de construction pour toits ou façades de climatisation et son utilisation comme évaporateur | Examination procedure | 12.06.1979 | Examination requested | 03.10.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.07.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.1981
03.11.1981
ADMISSIBLE Kabel- und Metallwerke Gutehoffnungshütte AG Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 3320 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.1981
03.11.1981
ADMISSIBLE Kabel- und Metallwerke Gutehoffnungshütte AG Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 3320 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | ||
Former [1981/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.1981
Kabel- und Metallwerke Gutehoffnungshütte AG Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 3320 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | 23.10.1981 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 02.11.1981 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 30.11.1981 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.05.1984 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.05.1984 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1984/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1981 | GB | 19.07.1982 | SE | 20.07.1982 | BE | 19.01.1983 | NL | 01.02.1983 | FR | 31.03.1983 | DE | 01.04.1983 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | CH | 28.01.1981 | |
LU | 31.07.1981 | ||
GB | 19.07.1982 | ||
SE | 20.07.1982 | ||
BE | 19.01.1983 | ||
NL | 01.02.1983 | ||
FR | 31.03.1983 | ||
DE | 01.04.1983 | ||
Former [1998/51] | CH | 28.01.1981 | |
GB | 19.07.1982 | ||
SE | 20.07.1982 | ||
BE | 19.01.1983 | ||
NL | 01.02.1983 | ||
FR | 31.03.1983 | ||
DE | 01.04.1983 | ||
Former [1985/26] | CH | 28.01.1981 | |
GB | 19.07.1982 | ||
SE | 20.07.1982 | ||
BE | 19.01.1983 | ||
NL | 01.02.1983 | ||
DE | 01.04.1983 | ||
Former [1984/29] | GB | 19.07.1982 | |
SE | 20.07.1982 | ||
BE | 19.01.1983 | ||
NL | 01.02.1983 | ||
DE | 01.04.1983 | ||
Former [1983/49] | SE | 20.07.1982 | |
BE | 19.01.1983 | ||
NL | 01.02.1983 | ||
DE | 01.04.1983 | ||
Former [1983/43] | SE | 20.07.1982 | |
BE | 19.01.1983 | ||
NL | 01.02.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2689090 (WETHERBEE GEORGE D, et al); | [A]FR1073253 ; | [A]US2693939 (LEWIS MARCHANT, et al); | [A]US3339629 (HERVEY DAVID E); | [A]US3952725 (EDMONDSON WILLIAM B); | [A]FR2302489 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]); | [AD]US4000850 (DIGGS RICHARD E); | [A]FR2317603 (ERAP [FR]); | [A]FR2330974 (AUNAC PIERRE [FR]); | [A]US4028854 (DIGGS RICHARD E) |