blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0000722

EP0000722 - Process for the preparation of polyurethanes containing arylsulfonic acid alkyl ester groups [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1982/39]Polyurethanes containing arylsulfonic acid alkyl ester groups and process for their preparation
[1982/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / Dieterich, Dieter, Dr.
Ludwig-Girtler-Strasse 1
D-5090 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date78100484.124.07.1978
Priority number, dateDE1977273504703.08.1977         Original published format: DE 2735047
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0000722
Date:21.02.1979
Language:DE
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0000722
Date:29.09.1982
Language:DE
[1982/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1978
ClassificationIPC:C08G18/77, C08G18/71
[1982/39]
CPC:
C08G18/775 (EP,US); C08G18/715 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Arylsulfonsäure Alkylester-Gruppen aufweisenden Polyurethanen[1982/39]
English:Process for the preparation of polyurethanes containing arylsulfonic acid alkyl ester groups[1982/39]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de polyuréthanes contenant des groupes ester alcoyle d'acide arylsulfonique[1982/39]
Former [1982/39]Arylsulfonsäurealkylestergruppen aufweisende Polyurethane und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung
Former [1982/39]Polyurethanes containing arylsulfonic acid alkyl ester groups and process for their preparation
Former [1982/39]Polyuréthanes contenant des groupes ester alcoyle d'acide arylsulfonique et leur procédé de préparation
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure24.07.1978Examination requested
05.07.1979Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0})
28.11.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.01.1981Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.1981Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
29.03.1982Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.1982Fee for grant paid
20.04.1982Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.06.1983No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1980Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.1981Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.1982Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[P]FR2370064  (BAYER AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.