EP0001386 - Apparatus for packaging objects with film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/01] | Packing device, especially for quadrangular objects | ||
[1981/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ilsemann, Heino Am Wehkamp 3 D-2800 Bremen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 78100583.0 | 03.08.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772735889 | 09.08.1977 Original published format: DE 2735889 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001386 | Date: | 18.04.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001386 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1978 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/06, B65B25/14, B65B51/30 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B65B9/067 (EP);
B65B51/303 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Gegenständen mittels Folie | [1981/01] | English: | Apparatus for packaging objects with film | [1981/01] | French: | Dispositif d'emballage d'objets au moyen d'une feuille | [1981/01] |
Former [1981/01] | Vorrichtung zum Verpacken, insbesondere von quaderförmigen Gegenständen | ||
Former [1981/01] | Packing device, especially for quadrangular objects | ||
Former [1981/01] | Appareil d'emballage d'objets, spécialement de forme quadrangulaire | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1979 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 07.03.1979 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request accepted | 21.08.1979 | Examination requested | 22.11.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.05.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3028294 [ ] (HISTED WILLIAM N); | US3060653 [ ] (VALER FLAX); | US3328936 [ ] (BILLEB CLYDE K); | US3338021 [ ] (KURT LIEDTKE); | US3551261 [ ] (HISTED WILLIAM N); | US3560305 [ ] (HINTS WILLIAM W); | US3653177 [ ] (ADAMS RICHARD C, et al) |