EP0001402 - Substituted piperidinhydroxycarboxylic acid amides, their preparation and their application as light stabilisers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1980 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiezer, Hartmut, Dr. Hans-Fischer-Strasse 6 D-8906 Gersthofen / DE | 02 /
Pfahler, Gerhard, Dr. Karlsbader Strasse 27 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Mayer, Norbert, Dr. Ziegelgrundweg 17 D-8901 Gablingen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78100868.5 | 12.09.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772742582 | 22.09.1977 Original published format: DE 2742582 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001402 | Date: | 18.04.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/66, C07D221/20, C07D471/10, C07D211/94, C08K5/34, // (C07D471/10, 221:00, 221:00) | CPC: |
C07D211/66 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Substituierte Piperidinhydroxyamide, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung als Lichtschutzmittel | English: | Substituted piperidinhydroxycarboxylic acid amides, their preparation and their application as light stabilisers | French: | Piperidinehydroxamides substituées, leur préparation et leur application comme agents protecteurs de la lumière | File destroyed: | 06.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 20.11.1979 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1980/11] | 31.03.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1695738 [ ] (SANKYO CO); | DE2602673 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | [X]FR2351102 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |