EP0002176 - Aqueous dispersion of plastics based on vinyl polymers and process for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nölken, Ernst, Dr. Dachbergstrasse 16a D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78100945.1 | 20.09.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772743764 | 29.09.1977 Original published format: DE 2743764 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002176 | Date: | 13.06.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002176 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/26, B01F17/14, C08K5/53, // (C08F2/26, 218:08) | [1983/24] | CPC: |
C09D17/001 (EP,US);
C08F2/24 (EP,US);
C09D5/027 (EP,US);
Y10S526/911 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Wässrige Kunststoffdispersion auf Basis von Vinylpolymeren und Herstellungsverfahren hierzu | English: | Aqueous dispersion of plastics based on vinyl polymers and process for producing same | French: | Dispersion aqueuse de matières plastiques à base de polymères de vinyle et procédé pour la préparer | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 16.08.1979 | Examination requested | 08.02.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 27.03.1981 | Appeal received No. T0016/81 | 06.05.1981 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.11.1981 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1981/47] | 13.01.1982 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1982/03] | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 21.09.1983 | BE | 30.09.1983 | CH | 30.09.1983 | LU | 30.09.1983 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | GB | 20.09.1983 | |
SE | 21.09.1983 | ||
BE | 30.09.1983 | ||
CH | 30.09.1983 | ||
LU | 30.09.1983 | ||
Former [1991/49] | GB | 20.09.1983 | |
SE | 21.09.1983 | ||
BE | 30.09.1983 | ||
CH | 30.09.1983 | ||
Former [1986/12] | GB | 20.09.1983 | |
SE | 21.09.1983 | ||
CH | 30.09.1983 | ||
Former [1984/35] | GB | 20.09.1983 | |
CH | 30.09.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2333417 ; | [AD]DE2441783 (HOECHST AG); | [A]US3963688 (LORENZ DONALD H, et al); | DE2535374 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | [P]DE2651048 (HOECHST AG) | Examination | - Kunststoff-Handbuch, Band II, S. 47-49, 1963 |