EP0001285 - Device for sterilisation of liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/23] | Device and process for sterilisation of liquids | ||
[1982/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reis, August K., Prof. Dr. med. Faistenbergerstrasse 1 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1980/18] |
Former [1980/18] | For all designated states Institut für Biomedizinische Technik Museumsinsel 1 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reis, August K., Prof. Dr. med. Faistenbergerstrasse 1 D-8000 München 90 / DE | 02 /
Kirmaier, Norbert L., Dr.-Ing. Mondstrasse 6 D-8011 Aschheim / DE | 03 /
Schöberl, Meinolf, Dipl.-Ing. Geigelstein strasse 8 D-8210 Prien/Chiemsee / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1981/22] |
Former [1980/18] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 78100950.1 | 21.09.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772742508 | 21.09.1977 Original published format: DE 2742508 | DE19772757854 | 23.12.1977 Original published format: DE 2757854 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001285 | Date: | 04.04.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001285 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/02, A61L2/24, C02F1/46 | [1982/23] | CPC: |
C02F1/46109 (EP);
A61L2/035 (EP);
C02F1/4672 (EP);
C02F1/36 (EP);
C02F2001/46128 (EP);
C02F2001/46152 (EP);
C02F2001/46161 (EP);
C02F2201/4611 (EP);
C02F2201/4613 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1982/23] | A61L1/00, A61L3/00, C02B3/02, C02C5/12 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entkeimung von Flüssigkeiten | [1982/23] | English: | Device for sterilisation of liquids | [1982/23] | French: | Dispositif pour stériliser des liquides | [1982/23] |
Former [1982/23] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Entkeimen von Flüssigkeiten | ||
Former [1982/23] | Device and process for sterilisation of liquids | ||
Former [1982/23] | Dispositif et procédé pour stériliser des liquides | Examination procedure | 28.09.1979 | Examination requested | 11.06.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.07.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 27.11.1981 | Date of receipt | 27.01.1982 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1981 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 09.06.1982 | BE | 21.09.1982 | SE | 22.09.1982 | CH | 30.09.1982 | LU | 30.09.1982 | [1999/52] |
Former [1984/28] | NL | 09.06.1982 | |
SE | 09.06.1982 | ||
BE | 21.09.1982 | ||
CH | 30.09.1982 | ||
Former [1983/43] | NL | 09.06.1982 | |
SE | 09.06.1982 | ||
CH | 30.09.1982 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH560170 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD); | DE2311504 [ ] (SEUBERT BERNHARD); | [A]FR2283699 (SACHS SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2224207 (SAINT GOBAIN TECHN NOUVELLES [FR]); | [A]CH319956 (LOOSLI HERMANN [CH]) |