EP0001423 - Agents for combating bacterial diseases in plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.1979 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seng, Florin, Dr. Am Katterbach 46 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Scheinpflug, Hans, Dr. Am Thelenhof 15 D-5090 Leverkussen 1 / DE | 03 /
Kraus, Peter, Dr. Düsseldorfer Strasse 43 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78100978.2 | 25.09.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772745007 | 06.10.1977 Original published format: DE 2745007 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001423 | Date: | 18.04.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A01N9/22, C07D487/04, // (C07D487/04, 241:00, 239:00) | CPC: |
C07D241/52 (EP);
A01N43/90 (EP);
C07D475/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Mittel zur Bekämpfung von Pflanzenbakteriosen | English: | Agents for combating bacterial diseases in plants | French: | Agents de lutte contre les maladies bactériennes des plantes | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 25.09.1978 | Examination requested | 22.06.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 18.07.1979 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1979 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1979 | Application withdrawn by applicant [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3985879 [ ] (SENG FLORIN, et al) |