blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0001761

EP0001761 - Process for the purification of tetrahydrofuran [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / Mueller, Herbert, Dr.
Carostrasse 53
D-6710 Frankenthal / DE
02 / Huchler, Otto Hermann, Dr.
Weinbietstrasse 38
D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date78101096.207.10.1978
Priority number, dateDE1977274878831.10.1977         Original published format: DE 2748788
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0001761
Date:16.05.1979
Language:DE
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0001761
Date:01.10.1980
Language:DE
[1980/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.1979
ClassificationIPC:C07D307/08
[1980/20]
CPC:
C07D307/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Reinigung von Tetrahydrofuran
English:Process for the purification of tetrahydrofuran
French:Procédé de purification de tétrahydrofuranne
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure25.05.1979Examination requested
19.09.1979Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
17.12.1979Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.1980Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
18.04.1980Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.1980Fee for grant paid
14.06.1980Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE1272293  [ ] (NAGYNYOMASU KISERLETI INTEZET);
 DE1693053  [ ] (DEGUSSA);
 DD31929  [ ];
 [A]US3935252  (TOMOMATSU HIDEO);
 [AD]US3980672  (TOMOMATSU HIDEO);
 [D]JPS495338B
 [D]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 21, 25 November 1974, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) M. YAMAGUCHI et al: "Separation of tetrahydrofuran and methanol", Seite 405, Kolonne 2Abstract Nr. 135933z; & JP-B-49 005 338 (MITSUBISHI) (06-02-1974)
 [A]  - BEILSTEINS HANDBUCH DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, Band 17, 1 Teil, 4. Auflage, 3. und 4. Erg{nzungswerk, 1974, Springer-Verlag Berlin, HeidelbergNew York. Seite 25
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.