EP0010553 - Process of reducing a loweralkyl 1-loweralkyl-pyrrole-2-glyoxylate to a loweralkyl 1-loweralkyl-pyrrole-2-acetate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.1984 [1984/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeilab, Inc. Camp Hill Road Fort Washington Pennsylvania 19034 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states McNeilab, Inc. Camp Hill Road Fort Washington Pennsylvania 19034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carmosin, Richard 1241, 65th Avenue Philadelphia, Pa. / US | [1980/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER, et al Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 78101245.5 | 27.10.1978 | [1980/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010553 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010553 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/337 | [1983/20] | CPC: |
C07D207/337 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/10] | C07D207/32 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE [1980/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduktion von Niederalkyl-1-niederalkyl-pyrrol-2-glyoxylaten zu Niederalkyl-1-niederalkyl-pyrrol-2-acetaten | [1980/10] | English: | Process of reducing a loweralkyl 1-loweralkyl-pyrrole-2-glyoxylate to a loweralkyl 1-loweralkyl-pyrrole-2-acetate | [1980/10] | French: | Procédé de réduction d'alkyle inférieur 1-alkyle inférieur-pyrrole-2-glyoxylates en alkyle inférieur 1-alkyle inférieur-pyrrole-2-acétates | [1980/10] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/04] | 31.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.09.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3846447 [ ]; | US3803169 [ ]; | DE1301313 [ ]; | US3752826 [ ]; | DE2737946 [ ]; | US3957818 [ ] | [ ] - JOURNAL FUR PRAKTISCHE CHEMIE, Vol. 35, 1967, Leipzig, M. SCHEITHAUER et al. "Zur Einwirkung von Schwefelwasserstoff auf 1,2-Diketone, alfa-Oxo-carbonsaureester und Carbonsaureanhydride bei Raumtemperatur" pages 41 to 48 * Page 44 * |