EP0001819 - Floor heating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seydel, Joachim Merricher Strasse 68 D-5040 Brühl / DE | 02 /
Dany, Franz-Josef, Dr. Kölner Ring 167 D-5042 Erftstadt / DE | 03 /
Kalteyer, Gerhard Laurentiusstrasse 8 D-5042 Erftstadt / DE | 04 /
Hündgen, Peter Von-Geyer-Ring 21 D-5030 Hürth / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78101255.4 | 28.10.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772749002 | 02.11.1977 Original published format: DE 2749002 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001819 | Date: | 16.05.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001819 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/00 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
F24D3/141 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/11] | F24H9/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, LU, NL | Title | German: | Fussbodenheizung | English: | Floor heating | French: | Chauffage par le plancher | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.09.1979 | Examination requested | 25.01.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.10.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1981 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE2504928 [ ] (FEIST ARTUS); | DE2551089 [ ] (BURR MARTIN); | [P]DE7806984U ; | [P]DE7810381U ; | [P]DE2658673 (PANTHERM GMBH) |