EP0002011 - Method and apparatus for producing carbon black [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states PHILLIPS Petroleum Company Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Austin, Oliver Kenneth 5835 SE Cornell Bartlesville, Okla; / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/01] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/02] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr. Dr. Wolfgang Dost, Udo Altenburg Dr. Jochen Pagenberg Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Galileiplatz 1 D-8000 München 80 / DE | ||
Former [1980/02] | Geissler, Bernhard, Dr. Widenmayerstrasse 24 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 78101301.6 | 03.11.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770848251 | 03.11.1977 Original published format: US 848251 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002011 | Date: | 30.05.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002011 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/50, C01B31/02 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
C09C1/50 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (US);
C01P2006/19 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Methode und Einrichtung zur Herstellung von Russ | English: | Method and apparatus for producing carbon black | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la production du noir de carbone | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.03.1979 | Examination requested | 29.06.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 20.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.12.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 16.11.1982 | [1983/43] | Documents cited: | Search | FR1290527 [ ] (CONTINENTAL CARBON CO) | Examination | US3175888 |