Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4315894 | 16.02.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | US10821079 | 28.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU512251B | Global Dossier | 02.10.1980 | B2 | AU4090278 | 24.04.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0002011 | Global Dossier | 30.06.1982 | B1 | EP0002011 | 30.05.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR7807091 | 10.07.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1097032 | 10.03.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2861926D1 | 19.08.1982 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES474663 | 16.12.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1101268 | 28.09.1985 | B | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5529112B | 01.08.1980 | B2 | JPS5472794 | 11.06.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR20577 | 21.01.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4206192 | 03.06.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA785835 | 26.09.1979 | B | Priority number | Date | US84825177 | 03.11.1977 |