EP0002045 - Process for preparing an ethylene oxide catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mross, Wolf Dieter, Dr. Londoner Ring 75 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Titzenthaler, Eckart, Dr. Lenbachstrasse 11 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Koopmann, Juergen, Dr. Walter-Bruch-Strasse 48 D-6730 Neustadt 11 / DE | 04 /
Schwarzmann, Matthias, Dr. Carl-Bosch-Strasse 54 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 05 /
Vogt, Volker, Dr. Carl-Bosch-Strasse 54 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78101354.5 | 11.11.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772751767 | 19.11.1977 Original published format: DE 2751767 | DE19782820520 | 11.05.1978 Original published format: DE 2820520 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002045 | Date: | 30.05.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002045 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/66, C07D301/10 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
C07D301/10 (EP,US);
B01J23/66 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US);
Y10S502/514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Äthylenoxydkatalysators | English: | Process for preparing an ethylene oxide catalyst | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un catalyseur pour la production de l'oxyde d'éthylène | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1979 | Examination requested | 29.10.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 16.06.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.09.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.03.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2253747 [ ] (ICI LTD [GB]); | [X]DE2521906 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [X]US3962136 (NIELSEN ROBERT P [US], et al); | [X]US4010115 (NIELSEN ROBERT P [US], et al); | [X]US4012425 (NIELSEN ROBERT P [US], et al); | [P]FR2359642 (HALCON INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) |