EP0002274 - Rescue capsule [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.08.1981 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1981 | Refusal of application | published on 07.10.1981 [1981/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hess, Helmut, Dr. Dieburger-Strasse 94 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | For all designated states Hess, Helmut, Jun. Dieburger-Strasse 94 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78101516.9 | 01.12.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772753911 | 03.12.1977 Original published format: DE 2753911 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002274 | Date: | 13.06.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A61G1/00, A61F7/00 | CPC: |
A61F7/02 (EP);
A61G1/0212 (EP);
A61G1/0231 (EP);
A61G1/0293 (EP);
A61F2007/0001 (EP);
A61G2203/76 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Rettungskapsel | English: | Rescue capsule | French: | Capsule de sauvetage | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/05] | 16.06.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1981/40] | 12.06.1981 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1981/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1980 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE7524657U [ ]; | DE2259894 [ ]; | DE1896209U [ ]; | DE6608268U [ ]; | [P]DE7736919U ; | [A]DE2241937 ; | [A]DE7526211U ; | [A]DE2003137 ; | [A]DE2112505 |