EP0000007 - Process for the polymerisation of alpha-olefins and method for preparing solid catalytic complexes for use in this polymerisation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/20] | Process for the polymerisation of alpha-olefins, solid catalytic complexes to be used during this polymerization, and process for their preparation | ||
[1981/20] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.09.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1984 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.11.1984 [1984/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY & Cie (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states SOLVAY & Cie (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states Société Anonyme dite: SOLVAY & Cie Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bienfait, Charles Mereldreef, 75 B-2850 Keerbergen / BE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1983/17] |
Former [1981/20] | Eischen, Roland Solvay & Cie Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek 310 B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 78200026.9 | 01.06.1978 | Priority number, date | LU19770077489 | 06.06.1977 Original published format: LU 77489 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000007 | Date: | 20.12.1978 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000007 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0000007 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1978 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/64, C08F4/02 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F2410/06 (EP);
Y10S526/908 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6555 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Polymerisation von alpha-Olefinen und Verfahren zur Herstellung von in diesem Polymerisationsverfahren verwendbaren festen katalytischen Komplexen | [1981/20] | English: | Process for the polymerisation of alpha-olefins and method for preparing solid catalytic complexes for use in this polymerisation process | [1981/20] | French: | Procédé pour la polymérisation des alpha-oléfines et procédé de préparation de complexes catalytiques solides utilisables pour cette polymérisation | [1981/20] |
Former [1981/20] | Verfahren zur Polymerisation von alpha-Olefinen, zur Polymerisation verwendbarer fester katalytischer Komplexe, und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | ||
Former [1981/20] | Process for the polymerisation of alpha-olefins, solid catalytic complexes to be used during this polymerization, and process for their preparation | ||
Former [1981/20] | Procédé pour la polymérisation des alpha-oléfines, complexes catalytiques solides utilisables pour cette polymérisation et procédé pour leur préparation | Examination procedure | 06.04.1979 | Examination requested | 31.03.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 19.06.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.09.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.1982
19.02.1982
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.1982
19.02.1982
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1982/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.1982
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 19.04.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.07.1982 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 20.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.06.1984 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.08.1984 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2016081 (HOECHST AG); | [X]FR2051159 (HOECHST AG); | [X]FR2093306 (SOLVAY); | [X]FR2162395 (SOLVAY); | [X]FR2189429 (SOLVAY [BE]); | [X]FR2243208 (SOLVAY [BE]); | [X]FR2307824 (SOLVAY [BE]); | [X]FR2324649 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]) |