Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
07.05.1980 | Change - applicant | published on 09.07.1980 [1980/14] |
28.05.1979 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
28.05.1979 | Request for conversion to national application | |
15.11.1978 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |