Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0000224 | Global Dossier | 10.01.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3584578 | Global Dossier | 08.11.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2227677 | 26.05.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE7T | 07.12.1979 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE8T | 07.12.1979 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | GB2227677 | 26.05.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR7804162 | 20.02.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1109759 | 29.09.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1129751 | 17.08.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2822472 | 14.12.1978 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB2227677 | 26.05.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2857161 | 10.12.1992 | C2 | DE2857161 | 06.03.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2391995 | 22.12.1978 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB2227677 | 26.05.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2423534 | 22.01.1982 | B1 | FR2423534 | 16.11.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB1572669 | 28.08.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2227677 | 26.05.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2040986 | 25.08.1982 | B | GB2040986 | 03.09.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2040987 | 25.08.1982 | B | GB2040987 | 03.09.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1097064 | 26.08.1985 | B | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS53147040 | 21.12.1978 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2227677 | 26.05.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5439416 | 26.03.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX147560 | 14.12.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL7805736 | 28.11.1978 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2227677 | 26.05.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL7815014 | 31.10.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ187147 | 31.08.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ18378777 | 04.04.1977 | GB2227677 | 26.05.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH15326 | 24.11.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4321165 | 23.03.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4333862 | 08.06.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA782481 | 25.04.1979 | B | Priority number | Date | GB2227677 | 26.05.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU525063B | Global Dossier | 21.10.1982 | B2 | AU3758778 | 03.01.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0000225 | Global Dossier | 10.01.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT400244B | 27.11.1995 | B | ATA469178 | 15.12.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR7804163 | 20.02.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH643881 | 29.06.1984 | A5 | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2857163 | 14.12.1989 | C2 | DE2857163 | 06.03.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2423537 | 31.12.1981 | B1 | FR2423537 | 16.11.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR63770 | 15.12.1979 | B | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1097286 | 31.08.1985 | B | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5439417 | 26.03.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX147454 | 03.12.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL7815015 | 31.10.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE446460 | 15.09.1986 | B | SE7907257L | 31.08.1979 | L | Priority number | Date | GB2727677 | 29.06.1977 | GB2727577 | 29.06.1977 |