EP0000236 - A method for controlling the energy balance of a system for catching, accumulating and transferring solar energy and a system therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1980 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Economic Energy Systems Investment N.V. Kaminda Michigan 3 Willemstad Curaçao Netherlands Antilles / NL | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baardman, Maarten Hoogstuk 48 Druten / NL | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78200073.1 | 03.07.1978 | Priority number, date | NL19770007337 | 01.07.1977 Original published format: NL 7707337 | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000236 | Date: | 10.01.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1978 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/02 | CPC: |
F24S50/40 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kontrollmethode und-system für die Energiebilanz eines Systems zum Auffangen, Speichern und Übertragen von Sonnenenergie | English: | A method for controlling the energy balance of a system for catching, accumulating and transferring solar energy and a system therefor | French: | Méthode et système de contrôle du bilan d'énergie d'un système de captation, d'accumulation et de transfert de l'énergie solaire | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 26.04.1979 | Examination requested | 30.07.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1980/18] | 17.05.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2575478 (WILSON LEON T); | [X]FR1138587 (RADIASOL); | FR2270535 [ ] (MADERN MARGUERITE [FR]); | [X]US3986489 (SCHLESINGER ROBERT J); | US4017028 [ ] (MANOR GIORA); | [X]US4019495 (FRAZIER CLIVE A, et al) |