EP0001467 - Stoving lacquers having an extended pot life on the basis of polyisocyanate masked with imidazolines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/42] | Stoving lackers having an extended pot life | ||
[1981/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMISCHE WERKE HÜLS AG Postfach 1320 D-4370 Marl 1 / DE | [1980/14] |
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states CHEMISCHE WERKE HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 1320 D-4370 Marl 1 / DE | ||
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states VEBA-CHEMIE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Pawikerstrasse 30 D-4660 Gelsenkirchen-Buer / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gras, Rainer, Dr. An der Ziegelei 91 D-4690 Herne 2 / DE | 02 /
Obendorf, Johann, Dr. Pastorsbusch 40 D-4270 Dorsten / DE | 03 /
Wolf, Elmar, Dr. Am Böckenbusch 3a D-4690 Herne 2 / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Steil, Hanna, Dipl.-Chem. RSP PATENTE-PB 40 Holsterhauser Strasse 160 Postfach 2840 D-4690 Herne 2 / DE | [1980/01] |
Former [1980/01] | Kniess, Friedrich, Dr. Herzogstrasse 28 Postfach 2840 D-4690 Herne 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 78200219.0 | 02.10.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772744782 | 05.10.1977 Original published format: DE 2744782 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001467 | Date: | 18.04.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001467 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/80, C09D3/72 | [1981/42] | CPC: |
C08G18/808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL | Title | German: | Lagerstabile Einbrennlacke auf Basis imidazolinblockierter Polyisocyanate | [1981/42] | English: | Stoving lacquers having an extended pot life on the basis of polyisocyanate masked with imidazolines | [1981/42] | French: | Vernis à cuire stables au stockage, à base de polyisocyanates bloqués par des imidazolines | [1981/42] |
Former [1981/42] | Lagerstabile Einbrennlacke | ||
Former [1981/42] | Stoving lackers having an extended pot life | ||
Former [1981/42] | Vernis à cuire à stabilité de stockage | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 30.08.1979 | Examination requested | 27.02.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - Keine Entgegenhaltungen |