Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0001855 | Global Dossier | 16.05.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE2056391 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE860385 | 01.03.1978 | A | Priority number | Date | BE2056391 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES239006Y | 16.05.1979 | Y | ES239006U | 16.12.1978 | U | Priority number | Date | BE2056391 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1160031 | 04.03.1987 | B | Priority number | Date | BE2056391 | 03.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4250936 | 17.02.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | BE2056391 | 03.11.1977 |