EP0001855 - Clamping device for a motor cycle wheel for the dismounting and mounting of a tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.1981 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.1981 [1981/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states du Quesne, Francis Kleistraat 138 B-2630 Aartselaar / BE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Ottelohe, Jozef René Bureau Ottelohe J.R. Postbus 3 Fruithoflaan 105 2600 Antwerpen (Berchem) / BE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78200262.0 | 26.10.1978 | Priority number, date | BE19772056391 | 03.11.1977 Original published format: BE 2056391 | [1981/35] |
Former [1981/35] | deleted | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001855 | Date: | 16.05.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B60C25/06 | CPC: |
B60B30/06 (EP,US);
B60C25/0545 (EP,US);
B60B2900/212 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Klemmvorrichtung für Motorradfelgen zum Auf- und Abmontieren eines Reifens | English: | Clamping device for a motor cycle wheel for the dismounting and mounting of a tyre | French: | Dispositif pour serrer une roue de motocyclette dont il y a lieu d'enlever un pneu ou sur laquelle un pneu doit être monté | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 09.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/02] | 28.03.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 21.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1981/38] | 16.06.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1824246 [ ] (DAAM GERRIT VAN); | US1966766 [ ] (LAURAN RABY RILEY, et al); | US2439615 [ ] (SMITH LEON A); | US2948314 [ ] (BISHMAN WALTER A); | US3191657 [ ] (LUND WALTER L); | US3918509 [ ] (TROTTER ROBERT MICHALE); | US4034786 [ ] (FELDMANN ROBERT G, et al) |