EP0000277 - Hinge assembly and vehicle including same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSEY FERGUSON INC. a Maryland Corporation 12601 Southfield Road Detroit Michigan 48232 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silaghi, Elmer William 36581 Saxony Farmington, Michigan / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Jones, David Bryn Patent and Trade Marks Department Massey-Ferguson Stareton, near Kenilworth Warwickshire CV8 2LJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/36] | Jones, David Bryn Patent and Trade Marks Department Massey-Ferguson Stareton, near Kenilworth Warwickshire CV8 2LJ / GB | ||
Former [1981/17] | Jones, David Bryn Massey-Ferguson Stareton near Kenilworth Warwickshire CV8 2LJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300085.4 | 27.06.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770811408 | 29.06.1977 Original published format: US 811408 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000277 | Date: | 10.01.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000277 | Date: | 29.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1978 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/12 | [1981/17] | CPC: |
E05F1/1276 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/50 (EP,US);
Y10S292/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Scharnier und ein mit diesem Scharnier versehenes Fahrzeug | English: | Hinge assembly and vehicle including same | French: | Charnière et véhicule comprenant cette dernière | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.06.1979 | Examination requested | 20.09.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 06.05.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 19.07.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.09.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1243561 [ ] (SIEVERS FA CARL); | US3388417 [ ] (UPCHURCH JOSEPH D); | US3621509 [ ] (BUGNELL FELIX C); | DE2162359 [ ]; | FR2280760 [ ] (LEURENT GHISLAIN [FR]) |