EP0000671 - Improved electrophotographic apparatus and method for use with electrophotosensitive toner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.1980 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurtz, Clark Nelson 74 Apollo Drive Rochester New York / US | 02 /
Cheng, Julian 390 Calmlake Circle Apartment C Rochester New York / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Pepper, John Herbert, et al KODAK LIMITED Patent Department P.O. Box 114 190 High Holborn London WC1V 7EA / GB | [1982/21] |
Former [1982/21] | Trangmar, Leigh Alan KODAK LIMITED Patent Department P.O. Box 114 190 High Holborn London WC1V 7EA / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300229.8 | 01.08.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770820960 | 01.08.1977 Original published format: US 820960 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0000671 | Date: | 07.02.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0000671 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1978 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/22, G03G13/01, G03G13/22, G03G15/01, G03G17/00 | CPC: |
G03G13/016 (EP);
G03G15/24 (EP);
G03G15/344 (EP);
G03G9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches Gerät und Verfahren zur Verwendung von elektrophotoleitfähigem Toner | English: | Improved electrophotographic apparatus and method for use with electrophotosensitive toner | French: | Appareil électrophotographique et procédé utilisant des particules de vireur électrophotoconductrices | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1979 | Examination requested | 05.12.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1980 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1980/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB950297 [ ]; | DE1910068 [ ]; | [D]US3100426 ; | [A]US3703335 ; | [A]DE2055993 ; | [A]DE1907903 | [ ] - R.M. SCHAFFERT: "ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHY", 1965, FOCAL PRESS, London and New Yorkpage 80 to 81 |