EP0001508 - Thermistor and method of fabricating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | For:BE
NL
SE
FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:BE
NL
SE
Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48121 / US | |||
Former [1980/12] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 210369 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:BE
NL
SE
Ford Motor Company Dearborn Wayne Michigan / US | |||
Former [1980/12] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
Ford - Werke Aktiengesellschaft Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 21 03 69 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:BE
NL
SE
FORD MOTOR COMPANY Dearborn Wayne Michigan / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merchant, Stanley Richard 30001 Leona Street Garden City Michigan 48135 / US | 02 /
Cermak, Michael Joseph 17281 Edwards Southfield Michigan 48076 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Drakeford, Robert William, et al 15/448 Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/04] | Drakeford, Robert William, et al 15/448 Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300462.5 | 05.10.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770839700 | 05.10.1977 Original published format: US 839700 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001508 | Date: | 18.04.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001508 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/04, G01N27/12, C04B35/46 | [1983/04] | CPC: |
C04B35/46 (EP);
G01N27/12 (EP);
H01C7/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Thermistor und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | English: | Thermistor and method of fabricating | French: | Thermistance et son procédé de fabrication | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.08.1979 | Examination requested | 17.01.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 25.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3893230 ; | [A]US3459503 ; | [A]US3639132 |