Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
11.07.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.1983 [1983/37] |
20.02.1980 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.04.1980 [1980/08] |
20.02.1980 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.04.1980 [1980/08] |