EP0009526 - Water-solubilizable epoxy resin and coating composition comprising the resin for metal food contact surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1983 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Ronald William 2820 Wooster Drive Allison Park Pennsylvania 15101 / US | 02 /
Lamanna, Richard Allen 190 Sycamore Drive McMurray Pennsylvania 15317 / US | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300482.3 | 10.10.1978 | [1980/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009526 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C09D3/58, C08G59/16, C08G59/42, B65D25/14 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
C08G59/4292 (EP);
C08G59/1455 (EP);
C09D163/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08L2666/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1980/08] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliches Epoxyharz und ein solches Harz enthaltende auf die Innenwand eines mit Nahrungsmitteln in Berührung kommenden Metallbehälters aufgebrachte Überzugszusammensetzung | [1980/08] | English: | Water-solubilizable epoxy resin and coating composition comprising the resin for metal food contact surfaces | [1980/08] | French: | Résine époxyde soluble dans l'eau et composition d'enduction contenant ladite résine appliquée sur des surfaces métalliques en contact avec des denrées alimentaires | [1980/08] | File destroyed: | 06.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1978 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 05.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/37] | 25.05.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1495249 [ ]; | FR1146564 [ ]; | DE1519329 [ ]; | FR1510809 [ ]; | FR1442890 [ ]; | FR1388543 [ ]; | FR2314222 [ ]; | DE2600811 [ ] |