EP0001707 - A thermally isolated monolithic semiconductor die and a process for producing such a die [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/41] | A thermally isolated monolithic semiconductor die, a process for producing such a die, and an RMS converter including a semiconductor die | ||
[1982/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHN FLUKE MFG. CO., INC. Post Office Box 43210 7001 220th Street Southwest Mountlake Terrace Washington 98043 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chapel, Roy W., Jr. 23417 93rd Avenue West Edmonds Washington 98020 / US | 02 /
Gurol, I. Macit 13048 42nd N.E. Seattle Washington 98125 / US | [1980/01] |
Former [1980/01] | 01 /
Chapel, Roy W., Jr. 23417 93rd Avenue West Edmonds Washington 98020 / US | ||
02 /
Gurol, I. Macit 13048 2nd N.E. Seattle Washington 98125 / US | Representative(s) | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/41] | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300510.1 | 17.10.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770842972 | 17.10.1977 Original published format: US 842972 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001707 | Date: | 02.05.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001707 | Date: | 13.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/76, H01L29/06, // G01R19/02, G06G7/20 | [1982/41] | CPC: |
H01L24/85 (EP,US);
G01R19/03 (EP,US);
H01L21/76264 (EP,US);
H01L21/764 (EP,US);
H01L23/147 (EP,US);
H01L23/4822 (EP,US);
H01L23/495 (EP,US);
H01L23/498 (EP,US);
H01L21/76289 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4823 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L27/0211 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01007 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01024 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01043 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01045 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01075 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12033 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48472, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/78 (US,EP);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12033, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1982/41] |
Former [N/P] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Thermisch isoliertes monolithisches Halbleiterplättchen und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines derartigen Plättchens | [1982/41] | English: | A thermally isolated monolithic semiconductor die and a process for producing such a die | [1982/41] | French: | Plaquette de semiconducteur monolithique, thermiquement isolée et procédé pour fabriquer une telle plaquette | [1982/41] |
Former [1982/41] | Thermisch isoliertes monolithisches Halbleiterplättchen, Verfahren zur Herstellung eines derartigen Plättchens und ein, ein derartiges Halbleiterplättchen umfassender Effektivwertwandler | ||
Former [1982/41] | A thermally isolated monolithic semiconductor die, a process for producing such a die, and an RMS converter including a semiconductor die | ||
Former [1982/41] | Plaquette de semiconducteur monolithique, thermiquement isolée, procédé pour fabriquer une telle plaquette et un convertisseur de valeur efficace comprenant une telle plaquette | Examination procedure | 16.10.1979 | Examination requested [1980/01] | 25.02.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 07.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2014743 [ ] (SIGNETICS CORP); | [X]DE1614393 (RAYTHEON CO); | DE2031333 [ ]; | FR2206589 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [X]US4023099 (VAN KESSEL THEODORUS JOZEF, et al) |