EP0002343 - A chemical-sensitive field-effect transistor, method of manufacture, and use in a probe and an instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/36] | Field-effect transistor, method of manufacture, and use in devices for measuring chemical activities | ||
[1981/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRCO, INC. 85 Chestnut Ridge Road Montvale New Jersey 07645 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guckel, Henry 201 North Whitney Way Madison Wisconsin 53705 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/36] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300673.7 | 28.11.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770856935 | 02.12.1977 Original published format: US 856935 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002343 | Date: | 13.06.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002343 | Date: | 09.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12, A61B5/00, G01N33/48, H01L29/78 | [1981/36] | CPC: |
A61B5/14542 (EP,US);
A61B5/1473 (EP,US);
G01N27/414 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/36] | G01N27/12, A61B5/00, G01N33/16, H01L29/78 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Chemisch empfindlicher Feldeffekttransistor, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, und Verwendung in einer Sonde und einer Einrichtung | [1981/36] | English: | A chemical-sensitive field-effect transistor, method of manufacture, and use in a probe and an instrument | [1981/36] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ sensible à des produits chimiques, procédé pour sa réalisation, et son utilisation dans une sonde et un appareil | [1981/36] |
Former [1981/36] | Feldeffekttransistor, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung in Einrichtungen zur Messung chemischer Eigenschaften | ||
Former [1981/36] | Field-effect transistor, method of manufacture, and use in devices for measuring chemical activities | ||
Former [1981/36] | Transistor à effet de champ, procédé pour sa fabrication et son utilisation dans des appareils pour la mesure de propriétés chimiques | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1979 | Examination requested | 25.03.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3831432 [ ] (COX P); | US3999122 [ ] (WINSTEL GUENTER, et al); | [D]US4020830 (JOHNSON CURTIS C, et al) | [ ] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 47, No. 13, November 1975, Washington, S.D. MOSS et al "Potassium ion-sensitive field effect transistor"pages 2238 to 2243. | [D] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, Vol. BME-19, No. 5, September 1972, New-York, P.BERGVELD "Development, Operation, and Application of the Ion Sensitive Field-Effect Transistor as a Tool for Electrophysiology"pages 342 to 351. | [D] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOXEDICAL ENGINEERING, Vol. BME-21, No. 6, November 1974, New-York, T. MATSUO et al "An Integrated Field-Effect Electrode for Biopotential Recording"page 485 to 487. | [P] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING Vol. BME-25, No. 2, March 1978, New-York, M. ESASHI et al "Integrated Micro Multi Ion Sensor Using Field-Effect of Semiconductor"pages 184 to 191. |