EP0002890 - Shielded electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Donald Percy George 15 Bruce House 195 Preston Hill Kenton Harrow Middlesex / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Stuart-Prince, Richard Geoffrey, et al 20 Queensmere Slough, Berkshire SL1 1YZ / GB | [1981/20] | Application number, filing date | 78300708.1 | 01.12.1978 | Priority number, date | GB19770053563 | 22.12.1977 Original published format: GB 5356377 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002890 | Date: | 11.07.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002890 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/12, H01R13/648 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
H01R13/6585 (EP,US);
H01R11/09 (EP,US);
H01R13/6599 (EP,US);
H01R31/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/20] | H01R23/06, H01R23/12, H01R13/34 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Abgeschirmter elektrischer Verbinder | English: | Shielded electrical connector | French: | Connecteur électrique blindé | Examination procedure | 18.07.1979 | Examination requested | 20.03.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1380281 [ ] (BUNKER RAMO); | US4027941 [ ] (NAROZNY RONALD S); | DE1946115 [ ] (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | [P]DE2644296 (SIEMENS AG) |